EP4033030 - SCRAPING DEVICE WITH LATERAL WINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.10.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.01.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Drivex AB P.O. Box 117 828 22 Edsbyn / SE | [2023/45] |
Former [2022/30] | For all designated states Drivex AB P.O.Box 117 828 22 Edsbyn / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BÄCKSTRÖM OLOFSSON, Jens 828 30 Edsbyn / SE | [2022/30] | Representative(s) | Bjerkén Hynell KB P.O. Box 1061 101 39 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/30] | Bjerkén Hynell KB Tulegatan 53 113 53 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 22151723.8 | 17.01.2022 | [2022/30] | Priority number, date | SE20210050083 | 26.01.2021 Original published format: SE 2150083 | [2022/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4033030 | Date: | 27.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4033030 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | E01H5/06 | [2022/30] | CPC: |
E01H5/06 (EP);
E01H5/061 (SE);
E01H5/062 (SE);
E01H5/063 (SE);
E01H5/067 (EP,SE);
E02F3/8152 (SE)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/09] |
Former [2022/30] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ABSTREIFVORRICHTUNG MIT SEITLICHEN FLÜGELN | [2022/30] | English: | SCRAPING DEVICE WITH LATERAL WINGS | [2022/30] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RACLAGE AVEC AILETTES LATÉRALES | [2022/30] | Examination procedure | 26.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/09] | 26.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 09.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/42] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.11.2023 | CZ | 08.11.2023 | DK | 08.11.2023 | EE | 08.11.2023 | ES | 08.11.2023 | HR | 08.11.2023 | IT | 08.11.2023 | LT | 08.11.2023 | LV | 08.11.2023 | MC | 08.11.2023 | NL | 08.11.2023 | PL | 08.11.2023 | RO | 08.11.2023 | RS | 08.11.2023 | SE | 08.11.2023 | SK | 08.11.2023 | SM | 08.11.2023 | LU | 17.01.2024 | BG | 08.02.2024 | GR | 09.02.2024 | IS | 08.03.2024 | PT | 08.03.2024 | [2024/43] |
Former [2024/40] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
CZ | 08.11.2023 | ||
DK | 08.11.2023 | ||
EE | 08.11.2023 | ||
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
IT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LV | 08.11.2023 | ||
MC | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RO | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
SK | 08.11.2023 | ||
SM | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
CZ | 08.11.2023 | ||
DK | 08.11.2023 | ||
EE | 08.11.2023 | ||
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
IT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LV | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RO | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
SK | 08.11.2023 | ||
SM | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
CZ | 08.11.2023 | ||
DK | 08.11.2023 | ||
EE | 08.11.2023 | ||
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LV | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RO | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
SM | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
DK | 08.11.2023 | ||
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LV | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
SM | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LV | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 08.11.2023 | |
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 09.02.2024 | |
IS | 08.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US4356645 (HINE GORDON, et al) [X] 1 * figures 1-15 * * column 3, lines 7-12 * * column 4, lines 5-7,30-32 * * page 7, lines 1-7 * * page 9, lines 39-47 * * the whole document * [I] 2-8,10-13; | [XDI]SE525295 (SILJUM MEKAN AB [SE]) [XD] 1,9 * figures 1-5 * * paragraph [0005] * * the whole document *[I] 2-8,10-13 | by applicant | SE525295 |