EP4209696 - GATE VALVE CAPABLE OF BEING OPENED AND CLOSED BY USING ELASTIC FORCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.06.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states King Lai Hygienic Materials Co., Ltd. 8F.-8, No. 8, Ziqiang S. Rd. 302044 Zhubei City, Hsinchu County / TW | [2023/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUANG, Shu-Mei 302044 HSINCHU COUNTY / TW | [2023/28] | Representative(s) | Straus, Alexander 2K Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bajuwarenring 14 82041 Oberhaching / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/28] | Straus, Alexander 2K Patent- und Rechtsanwälte - München Keltenring 9 82041 Oberhaching / DE | Application number, filing date | 22152161.0 | 19.01.2022 | [2023/28] | Priority number, date | TW20220100346 | 05.01.2022 Original published format: TW 111100346 | [2023/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4209696 | Date: | 12.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F16K3/316, F16K3/18, F16K3/314, F16K3/28, F16K3/02 | [2023/28] | CPC: |
F16K3/3165 (EP,US);
F16K3/184 (EP,US);
F16K3/0281 (US);
F16K3/029 (EP,US);
F16K3/18 (US);
F16K3/314 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DURCH ELASTISCHE KRAFT ÖFFEN- UND SCHLIESSBARES ABSPERRVENTIL | [2023/28] | English: | GATE VALVE CAPABLE OF BEING OPENED AND CLOSED BY USING ELASTIC FORCE | [2023/28] | French: | ROBINET-VANNE POUVANT ÊTRE OUVERTE ET FERMÉE À L'AIDE D'UNE FORCE ÉLASTIQUE | [2023/28] | Examination procedure | 19.01.2022 | Examination requested [2023/28] | 21.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1945901 (SCHERTLER SIEGFRIED); | [A]EP0314832 (LEYBOLD AG [DE]); | [Y]US5101861 (DEVILLE PATRICE [FR], et al); | [A]US5379983 (GEISER FRIEDRICH [AT]); | [X]US2006169940 (MAYER THOMAS [AT], et al); | [A]US2007057220 (BOSCH HUBERT [AT]); | [XYI]CN203272833U (HIGHLIGHT TECHNOLOGY CORP); | [A]EP3043093 (KING LAI HYGIENIC MATERIALS CO LTD [TW]); | [A]CN110043711B | by applicant | CN204267768U | CN107923554 |