blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4215281

EP4215281 - POWDER SPRAY NOZZLE FOR SPRAYING COATING POWDER, COMBINATION OF ELECTRODE HOLDER AND POWDER SPRAY NOZZLE, AND SPRAY APPLICATOR WITH POWDER SPRAY NOZZLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.11.2024
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  29.07.2024
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  02.02.2024
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  23.06.2023
Most recent event   Tooltip02.05.2025Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 04.06.2025 [2025/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wagner International AG
Industriestrasse 22
9450 Altstätten / CH
[2024/35]
Former [2023/30]For all designated states
WAGNER INTERNATIONAL AG
Industriestrasse 22
9450 Altstätten / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Loos, Eugen
88069 Tettnang / DE
02 / Donati, Thomas
9450 Lüchingen / CH
 [2023/30]
Representative(s)Nückel, Thomas
Patentanwaltskanzlei Nückel
Eichweidstrasse 22
8820 Wädenswil / CH
[2024/51]
Former [2023/30]Nückel, Thomas
Patentanwaltskanzlei Nückel
Oberdorfstrasse 16
8820 Wädenswil / CH
Application number, filing date22152324.419.01.2022
[2023/30]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4215281
Date:26.07.2023
Language:DE
[2023/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP4215281
Date:18.12.2024
Language:DE
[2024/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.06.2022
ClassificationIPC:B05B5/00
[2023/30]
CPC:
B05B5/0533 (EP); B05B5/032 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2024/10]
Former [2023/30]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:PULVERSPRÜHDÜSE ZUM VERSPRÜHEN VON BESCHICHTUNGSPULVER, KOMBINATION AUS ELEKTRODENHALTER UND PULVERSPRÜHDÜSE SOWIE SPRÜHAPPLIKATOR MIT PULVERSPRÜHDÜSE[2023/30]
English:POWDER SPRAY NOZZLE FOR SPRAYING COATING POWDER, COMBINATION OF ELECTRODE HOLDER AND POWDER SPRAY NOZZLE, AND SPRAY APPLICATOR WITH POWDER SPRAY NOZZLE[2023/30]
French:BUSE DE PULVÉRISATION DE POUDRE PERMETTANT DE PULVÉRISER DU POUDRE DE REVÊTEMENT, COMBINAISON DE PORTE-ÉLECTRODE ET DE BUSE DE PULVÉRISATION DE POUDRE, AINSI QU'APPLICATEUR DE PULVÉRISATION POURVU DE BUSE DE PULVÉRISATION DE POUDRE[2023/30]
Examination procedure23.01.2024Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.01.2024Examination requested  [2024/10]
26.01.2024Date on which the examining division has become responsible
30.07.2024Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.11.2024Fee for grant paid
06.11.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.11.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2024Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBG18.12.2024
FI18.12.2024
HR18.12.2024
LV18.12.2024
NO18.03.2025
RS18.03.2025
GR19.03.2025
[2025/23]
Documents cited:Search[XD]DE29924481U  (ITW GEMA AG [CH]);
 [X]US9616440  (DIETRICH HANSPETER [CH], et al)
by applicantDE29924481U
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.