EP4063126 - LIQUID DISCHARGE HEAD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RISO Technologies Corporation 5-34-7 Shiba Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8385 / JP | [2024/41] |
Former [2022/39] | For all designated states Toshiba TEC Kabushiki Kaisha 1-11-1, Osaki Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8562 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shimosato, Masashi Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141-8562 / JP | 02 /
Goto, Taiki Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141-8562 / JP | 03 /
Hamada, Akio Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141-8562 / JP | [2022/39] | Representative(s) | Bandpay & Greuter 11 rue Christophe Colomb 75008 Paris / FR | [2024/30] |
Former [2022/39] | Bandpay & Greuter 30, rue Notre-Dame des Victoires 75002 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 22152644.5 | 21.01.2022 | [2022/39] | Priority number, date | JP20210051490 | 25.03.2021 Original published format: JP 2021051490 | [2022/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4063126 | Date: | 28.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4063126 | Date: | 24.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/14 | [2022/39] | CPC: |
B41J2/14274 (EP);
B41J2/14201 (CN,US);
H10N30/057 (US);
H10N30/063 (US);
H10N30/088 (US);
H10N30/2047 (US);
H10N30/50 (US);
H10N30/8542 (US);
H10N30/8554 (US);
H10N30/871 (US);
H10N30/872 (US);
H10N30/875 (US);
B41J2002/14491 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/18] |
Former [2022/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKEITSAUSSTOSSKOPF | [2022/39] | English: | LIQUID DISCHARGE HEAD | [2022/39] | French: | TÊTE DE D'ÉVACUATION DE LIQUIDE | [2022/39] | Examination procedure | 20.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/18] | 28.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP0931651 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]); | [A]US2004218019 (TAKAHASHI TOMOAKI [JP]); | [XYI]JP2012232457 (RICOH CO LTD) |