EP4216419 - SWITCHED CURRENT SOURCE CIRCUITS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.09.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.05.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.12.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.06.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Socionext Inc. 2-10-23 Shin-Yokohama Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 222-0033 / JP | [2023/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUNT, Kenneth Stephen Maidenhead, SL6 4FJ / GB | [2023/30] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | [2023/30] | Application number, filing date | 22152827.6 | 21.01.2022 | [2023/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4216419 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4216419 | Date: | 09.10.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H02M3/07, H02M1/00, H03M1/74 | [2024/22] | CPC: |
H02M3/07 (EP,CN);
H03K17/687 (US);
H02M1/0087 (EP);
H03K17/06 (US);
H03K19/08 (US);
H03M1/66 (CN,US);
H03M1/742 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/30] | H02M3/07, H02M1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/05] |
Former [2023/30] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | GESCHALTETE STROMQUELLENSCHALTUNGEN | [2023/30] | English: | SWITCHED CURRENT SOURCE CIRCUITS | [2023/30] | French: | CIRCUITS DE SOURCE DE COURANT À COMMUTATION | [2023/30] | Examination procedure | 28.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/05] | 28.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2002075705 (BAYER ERICH [DE], et al); | [XI]US2005104651 (HASHIMOTO FUMINORI [JP]); |