EP4113546 - FABRICATION METHOD FOR A COMPONENT HAVING MAGNETIC & NON-MAGNETIC DUAL PHASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.05.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2023/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUANG, Shenyan Niskayuna, 12309 / US | 02 /
ZOU, Min Niskayuna, 12309 / US | 03 /
BURESH, Steve John Niskayuna, 12309 / US | 04 /
ZHANG, Wanming Niskayuna, 12309 / US | 05 /
SUBRAMANIAN, Pazhayannur Ramanathan Clifton Park, 12065 / US | [2023/01] | Representative(s) | Openshaw & Co. 8 Castle Street Farnham, Surrey GU9 7HR / GB | [2023/01] | Application number, filing date | 22153066.0 | 24.01.2022 | [2023/01] | Priority number, date | US202117236322 | 21.04.2021 Original published format: US202117236322 | [2023/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4113546 | Date: | 04.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01F1/147, C21D3/08, C21D8/12, C23C8/04 | [2023/01] | CPC: |
H01F1/147 (EP);
H01F41/02 (CN);
C21D3/08 (EP,CN,US);
C21D1/70 (EP);
C21D1/72 (EP);
C21D1/74 (EP);
C21D1/773 (EP);
C21D8/1255 (EP);
C22C38/001 (EP);
C22C38/04 (EP);
C22C38/18 (EP);
C23C8/04 (US);
H02K15/02 (US);
H02K15/12 (US);
C21D2211/00 (EP);
C21D2211/001 (US);
C21D2211/005 (EP);
C21D2211/008 (EP);
C21D2221/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/25] |
Former [2023/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES BAUTEILS MIT MAGNETISCHEN UND NICHTMAGNETISCHEN DOPPELPHASEN | [2023/01] | English: | FABRICATION METHOD FOR A COMPONENT HAVING MAGNETIC & NON-MAGNETIC DUAL PHASES | [2023/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN COMPOSANT À DOUBLE PHASE MAGNÉTIQUE ET NON MAGNÉTIQUE | [2023/01] | Examination procedure | 16.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/25] | 16.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]GB2333906 (AISIN SEIKI [JP]) [I] 1-15 * page 6, paragraph 2 * * page 7, paragraph 3 * * figures 4,5 *; | [A]US2014239763 (RAMINOSOA TSARAFIDY [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * claims 1,11-17 *; | [A]US2014265708 (GALIOTO STEVEN JOSEPH [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0031]; claims 16-20 *; | [A]US2015115749 (DIAL LAURA CERULLY [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-20 *; | [A]US2016087503 (GALIOTO STEVEN JOSEPH [US], et al) [A] 1-15* figures 3,4; claims 10-16 *; | [A]US2018175678 (PAPINI FRANCESCO [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0053] - [0060]; figure 8; claims 17-20 *; | [A]WO2020171174 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * claims 5,6 *; | [A] - MOSECKER LINDA ET AL, "Nitrogen in chromium-manganese stainless steels: a review on the evaluation of stacking fault energy by computational thermodynamics", SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY OF ADVANCED MATERIALS, vol. 14, no. 3, doi:10.1088/1468-6996/14/3/033001, ISSN 1468-6996, (20130301), pages 033001 - 6996, URL: http://publications.rwth-aachen.de/record/234794/files/234794.pdf, XP055982343 [A] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/1468-6996/14/3/033001 | by applicant | US7489062 |