Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Event history: EP4215723


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
24.05.2024 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  26.06.2024  [2024/26]
07.03.2024 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
17.02.2024 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
23.06.2023 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  26.07.2023  [2023/30]