blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4215723

EP4215723 - TURBOMACHINE FOR SUPERCRITICAL CO2 [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.05.2024
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  23.06.2023
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2024Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.06.2024  [2024/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Siemens Energy Global GmbH & Co. KG
Otto-Hahn-Ring 6
81739 München / DE
[2023/30]
Inventor(s)01 / Glos, Stefan
45657 Recklinghausen / DE
02 / Schäfer, Dennis
46045 Oberhausen / DE
03 / Wechsung, Michael
45470 Mülheim an der Ruhr / DE
 [2023/30]
Application number, filing date22153078.525.01.2022
[2023/30]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4215723
Date:26.07.2023
Language:DE
[2023/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.06.2022
ClassificationIPC:F01K25/10, F03G4/00
[2023/30]
CPC:
F03G4/037 (EP); F03G4/026 (EP); F03G4/029 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2023/30]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:STRÖMUNGSMASCHINE FÜR SUPERKRITISCHES CO2[2023/30]
English:TURBOMACHINE FOR SUPERCRITICAL CO2[2023/30]
French:TURBOMACHINE DE CO2 SUPERCRITIQUE[2023/30]
Examination procedure27.01.2024Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2024/26]
16.02.2024Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2024/26]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.202403   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US9803626  (EASTMAN ALAN D [US], et al) [A] 1,12 * figures 2,3; claim 1 *;
 [XAI]CN111005771B  (UNIV TSINGHUA) [X] 1,12 * paragraphs [0005] , [0032]; figures 1-5; claim 1 * [A] 9-11,15,16 [I] 2-8,13,14;
 [XAI]CN111156052B  (UNIV TSINGHUA) [X] 1,12 * paragraphs [0032] , [0036]; figures 1-5; claim 1 * [A] 9-11,15,16 [I] 2-8,13,14;
 [A]CN113688565  (UNIV DALIAN TECH) [A] 1,12* figures 5,6; claim 1 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.