Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP4009166 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP4009166



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 897
19.11.2024 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
10.10.2024 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
27.09.2024 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.09.2024 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
27.09.2024 French translation of claims Search / examination 7
27.09.2024 German translation of the claims Search / examination 6
27.09.2024 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
29.05.2024 Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
29.05.2024 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
29.05.2024 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
29.05.2024 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
29.05.2024 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 142
29.05.2024 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 142
02.05.2024 Examination started Search / examination 1
15.12.2023 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.12.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.12.2023 Enquiry as to the processing of the file Search / examination 1
11.12.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
07.12.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
07.12.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
07.12.2023 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
07.12.2023 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
07.12.2023 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
08.12.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
08.12.2022 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
08.12.2022 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
08.12.2022 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 89
08.12.2022 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 90
08.12.2022 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
08.12.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
13.06.2022 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 2
11.05.2022 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
22.04.2022 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
22.04.2022 European search opinion Search / examination 7
22.04.2022 European search report Search / examination 2
22.04.2022 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
25.01.2022 Abstract Search / examination 1
25.01.2022 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
25.01.2022 Claims Search / examination 4
25.01.2022 Description Search / examination 114
25.01.2022 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
25.01.2022 Drawings Search / examination 52
25.01.2022 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
05.01.2015 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 180