EP4008228 - REMOVABLE ROTATABLE AGITATOR WITH A TAB CONFIGURED TO BE GRIPPED BY A USER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.02.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.06.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SharkNinja Operating LLC 89 A Street, Suite 100 Needham, MA 02494 / US | [2022/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THORNE, Jason B. Wellesley Hills, Massachusetts, 02481 / US | 02 /
XU, Kai Suzhou, 215000 / CN | 03 /
XU, AiMing Suzhou / CN | 04 /
BROWN, Andre David North Curry Somerset, TA3 6LU / GB | 05 /
BURKE, Brian Barrington, Rhode Island, 02806 / US | 06 /
D'AMICO, Michael Mansfield, Massachusetts, 02048 / US | 07 /
HUTCHINSON, Peter Suzhou, 215128 / CN | 08 /
BURKE, Erin Boston, Massachusetts, 02127 / US | [2022/23] | Representative(s) | Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP Thierschplatz 6 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/23] | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 22153318.5 | 28.01.2016 | [2022/23] | Priority number, date | US201562110232P | 30.01.2015 Original published format: US 201562110232 P | US201514739915 | 15.06.2015 Original published format: US201514739915 | US201514744438 | 19.06.2015 Original published format: US201514744438 | US201514801185 | 16.07.2015 Original published format: US201514801185 | US201514812734 | 29.07.2015 Original published format: US201514812734 | US201514867599 | 28.09.2015 Original published format: US201514867599 | [2022/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4008228 | Date: | 08.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4008228 | Date: | 08.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A47L9/04, A47L5/30 | [2022/23] | CPC: |
A47L9/0477 (EP,KR);
A47L9/04 (CN);
A47L5/30 (EP,KR);
A47L9/0411 (EP);
A47L9/0444 (EP,KR);
A47L9/0455 (EP,KR);
A47L9/0461 (CN)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/29] |
Former [2022/23] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ABNEHMBARER DREHBARER RÜHRER MIT EINEM KNOPF ZUM GREIFEN DURCH EINEN BENUTZER | [2022/23] | English: | REMOVABLE ROTATABLE AGITATOR WITH A TAB CONFIGURED TO BE GRIPPED BY A USER | [2022/23] | French: | AGITATEUR TOURNABLE AMOVIBLE AVEC UNE POIGNÉE CONFIGURÉE D'ÊTRE SAISIT PAR UN UTILISATEUR | [2022/23] | Examination procedure | 14.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/29] | 14.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16744107.0 / EP3250102 | Divisional application(s) | EP23159789.9 / EP4212079 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
30.11.2023
06.12.2023
ADMISSIBLE JIAO, Yejun No. 119 Heshengbinjiangdijing Yuqiaodongli, Tongzhou District Beijing, 101101 / CN Opponent's representative Strachan, Victoria Jane Strachan IP Limited New Cottage Marden Hereford HR1 3EN / GB | [2024/31] |
Former [2024/02] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
30.11.2023
06.12.2023
ADMISSIBLE JIAO, Yejun No. 119 Heshengbinjiangdijing Yuqiaodongli, Tongzhou District Beijing, 101101 / CN Opponent's representative Strachan, Victoria Jane Strachan IP Limited Atholl Cottage Vowchurch Common Road Vowchurch, Hereford HR2 0RL / GB | 22.12.2023 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 22.04.2024 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.03.2023 | CZ | 08.03.2023 | DK | 08.03.2023 | EE | 08.03.2023 | FI | 08.03.2023 | HR | 08.03.2023 | LT | 08.03.2023 | LV | 08.03.2023 | MC | 08.03.2023 | NL | 08.03.2023 | PL | 08.03.2023 | RO | 08.03.2023 | RS | 08.03.2023 | SE | 08.03.2023 | SI | 08.03.2023 | SK | 08.03.2023 | SM | 08.03.2023 | NO | 08.06.2023 | GR | 09.06.2023 | IS | 08.07.2023 | PT | 10.07.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/10] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
DK | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
PL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SI | 08.03.2023 | ||
SK | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
IS | 08.07.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
PL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SK | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
IS | 08.07.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | FI | 08.03.2023 | |
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | FI | 08.03.2023 | |
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | FI | 08.03.2023 | |
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | FI | 08.03.2023 | |
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 08.03.2023 | |
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 08.03.2023 | |
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 08.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5309601 (HAMPTON LEONARD D [US], et al); | [A]JPH10127542 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]US5960514 (MILLER DANIEL R [US], et al); | [XIA]WO2011158596 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al) | by applicant | US7329294 | Opposition | WO2005111084 | WO2015015166 |