EP4036957 - SILICON CARBIDE VERTICAL CONDUCTION MOSFET DEVICE FOR POWER APPLICATIONS AND MANUFACTURING PROCESS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.01.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.r.l. Via C. Olivetti, 2 20864 Agrate Brianza (MB) / IT | [2022/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAGGIO, Mario Giuseppe 95020 ACI BONACCORSI / IT | 02 /
FRAZZETTO, Alessia Maria 95030 SANT'AGATA LI BATTIATI / IT | 03 /
ZANETTI, Edoardo 95028 VALVERDE / IT | 04 /
GUARNERA, Alfio 95039 TRECASTAGNI / IT | [2022/31] | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A., et al Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2022/31] | Cerbaro, Elena, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 22153333.4 | 25.01.2022 | [2022/31] | Priority number, date | IT20210001895 | 29.01.2021 Original published format: IT202100001895 | [2022/31] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4036957 | Date: | 03.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/336, H01L29/16, H01L21/04, H01L29/78, H01L29/08, H01L29/417 | [2022/31] | CPC: |
H01L29/66068 (EP,US);
H01L29/086 (EP,US);
H01L21/046 (EP);
H01L21/0465 (US);
H01L29/0869 (EP);
H01L29/1095 (US);
H01L29/1608 (EP,US);
H01L29/41766 (EP);
H01L29/7802 (EP,US);
H01L29/0696 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/09] |
Former [2022/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERTIKAL LEITENDE MOSFET-VORRICHTUNG AUS SILIZIUMKARBID FÜR ENERGIEANWENDUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2022/31] | English: | SILICON CARBIDE VERTICAL CONDUCTION MOSFET DEVICE FOR POWER APPLICATIONS AND MANUFACTURING PROCESS THEREOF | [2022/31] | French: | DISPOSITIF MOSFET DE CONDUCTION VERTICAL À CARBURE DE SILICIUM POUR DES APPLICATIONS ÉLECTRIQUES ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2022/31] | Examination procedure | 25.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/09] | 25.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2016163817 (HORII TAKU [JP], et al); | [X]US2017077285 (UEHARA JUNICHI [JP], et al); | [X]WO2019198168 (SHINDENGEN ELECTRIC MFG [JP]) | by applicant | US2016163817 | US2017077285 | WO2019198168 |