Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP4015537 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP4015537



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






All documents(33)
Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 321
05.02.2025 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
29.01.2024 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
24.01.2024 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
04.01.2024 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
07.12.2023 Submission concerning change of applicant's address Search / examination 6
12.12.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.12.2022 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
12.12.2022 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
12.12.2022 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
12.12.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
27.06.2022 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 2
25.05.2022 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
20.05.2022 Refund of fees Search / examination 2
17.05.2022 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
17.05.2022 European search opinion Search / examination 4
17.05.2022 European search report Search / examination 3
17.05.2022 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
06.05.2022 Search started Search / examination 1
16.02.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
16.02.2022 (Partial) description filed in response to formal objections Search / examination 1
16.02.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
16.02.2022 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
07.02.2022 Deficiencies in application documents - annex B Search / examination 3
27.01.2022 Abstract Search / examination 1
27.01.2022 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
27.01.2022 Claims Search / examination 3
27.01.2022 Sequence listing Search / examination -
27.01.2022 Description Search / examination 122
27.01.2022 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
27.01.2022 Drawings Search / examination 15
27.01.2022 Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) Search / examination 6
27.06.2017 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 126
08.06.2017 Sequence listing Search / examination -