EP4219937 - AUXILIARY POWER SUPPLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.06.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy A/S Borupvej 16 7330 Brande / DK | [2023/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hawkins, Samuel 7100 Vejle / DK | 02 /
Nielsen, Rene Salkvist 7451 Sunds / DK | [2023/31] | Representative(s) | SGRE-Association Siemens Energy Global GmbH & Co. KG SE I IM P Intellectual Property Siemenspromenade 9 91058 Erlangen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/31] | SGRE-Association Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy GmbH & Co KG Schlierseestraße 28 81539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 22153883.8 | 28.01.2022 | [2023/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4219937 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F03D80/00 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
F03D80/003 (EP);
F03D13/30 (EP);
F05B2260/42 (EP);
F05B2260/76 (EP);
F05B2270/107 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HILFSSTROMVERSORGUNG | [2023/31] | English: | AUXILIARY POWER SUPPLY | [2023/31] | French: | ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE AUXILIAIRE | [2023/31] | Examination procedure | 03.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/29] | 13.03.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/29] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2024 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2010109262 (CLIPPER WINDPOWER INC [US], et al); | [X]DE102009017244 (NORDEX ENERGY GMBH [DE]); | [X]EP2282055 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]); | [X]US2012056425 (COUSINEAU KEVIN L [US]) |