EP4220557 - METHOD AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT FOR DETERMINING A POSE OF A BODY MODEL IN 3D SPACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.06.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 02.02.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] | 02.02.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Reactive Reality AG Waltendorfer Hauptstrasse 32a 8010 Graz / AT | [2023/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Azizi, Niloofar 8010 Graz / AT | 02 /
Poier, Georg 8010 Graz / AT | 03 /
Grasmug, Philipp 8010 Graz / AT | 04 /
Hauswiesner, Stefan 8010 Graz / AT | [2023/31] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [2023/31] | Application number, filing date | 22153890.3 | 28.01.2022 | [2023/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4220557 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/73, G06V10/82, G06V40/20 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
G06T7/73 (EP);
G06V40/23 (EP);
G06T2207/10004 (EP);
G06T2207/20072 (EP);
G06T2207/20084 (EP);
G06T2207/30196 (EP);
G06V10/82 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/10] |
Former [2023/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKT ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINER HALTUNG EINES KÖRPERMODELLS IM 3D-RAUM | [2023/31] | English: | METHOD AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT FOR DETERMINING A POSE OF A BODY MODEL IN 3D SPACE | [2023/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET PRODUIT-PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE POUR DÉTERMINER UNE POSE D'UN MODÈLE DE CORPS DANS UN ESPACE 3D | [2023/31] | Examination procedure | 30.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/10] | 30.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN113420676 (UNIV HUAQIAO, et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A] - ZHAO LONG ET AL, "Semantic Graph Convolutional Networks for 3D Human Pose Regression", 2019 IEEE/CVF CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION AND PATTERN RECOGNITION (CVPR), IEEE, (20190615), doi:10.1109/CVPR.2019.00354, pages 3420 - 3430, XP033686284 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CVPR.2019.00354 | [A] - CAI YUJUN ET AL, "Exploiting Spatial-Temporal Relationships for 3D Pose Estimation via Graph Convolutional Networks", 2019 IEEE/CVF INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION (ICCV), IEEE, (20191027), doi:10.1109/ICCV.2019.00236, pages 2272 - 2281, XP033723431 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICCV.2019.00236 | [A] - JIANG HAIYONG ET AL, "Skeleton-Aware 3D Human Shape Reconstruction From Point Clouds", 2019 IEEE/CVF INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION (ICCV), IEEE, (20191027), doi:10.1109/ICCV.2019.00553, pages 5430 - 5440, XP033723110 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICCV.2019.00553 | [A] - THEODOROS SOFIANOS ET AL, "Space-Time-Separable Graph Convolutional Network for Pose Forecasting", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20211009), XP091075865 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | by applicant | - CATALIN IONESCUDRAGOS PAPAVAVLAD OLARUCRISTIAN SMINCHISESCU, "Human3.6M: Large Scale Datasets and Predictive Methods for 3D Human Sensing in Natural Environments", IEEE Transactions on Pattern Analysis and Machine Intelligence, (20140700), vol. 36, no. 7, doi:10.1109/TPAMI.2013.248, XP011551855 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TPAMI.2013.248 |