EP4049524 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR IRRIGATING AGRICULTURAL FIELDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.05.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Precision Planting LLC 23207 Townline Road Tremont, IL 61568 / US | [2022/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STOLLER, Jason Morton, 61550 / US | [2022/35] | Representative(s) | AGCO Intellectual Property Department AGCO Limited Abbey Park Stoneleigh Kenilworth CV8 2TQ / GB | [2022/35] | Application number, filing date | 22154080.0 | 28.01.2022 | [2022/35] | Priority number, date | US202163153127P | 24.02.2021 Original published format: US 202163153127 P | [2022/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4049524 | Date: | 31.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4049524 | Date: | 31.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A01C23/00, A01C23/04, A01G25/09 | [2022/35] | CPC: |
A01G25/095 (EP);
A01M7/0085 (US);
A01B51/026 (US);
A01B63/006 (US);
A01C23/008 (US);
A01M7/0014 (US);
A01C23/042 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/14] |
Former [2022/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUM BEWÄSSERN LANDWIRTSCHAFTLICHER FELDER | [2022/35] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR IRRIGATING AGRICULTURAL FIELDS | [2022/35] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR IRRIGUER DES CHAMPS AGRICOLES | [2022/35] | Examination procedure | 08.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/14] | 28.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5092422 (HOOD JR CLARENCE E [US], et al); | [I]US2018222270 (SLAWSON JAMES [US]); | [I]US10569612 (BITTNER ROY A [US], et al); | [X]WO2020257456 (MA IND LLC [US]) | by applicant | US9296273 | US10375949 |