EP4040011 - A DAMPER WITH AN ANNULAR BASE VALVE FLOW SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.02.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fox Factory, Inc. 2055 Sugarloaf Circle Suite 300 Duluth, GA 30097 / US | [2022/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ESTON, Tyler Duluth, GA 30097 / US | [2022/32] | Representative(s) | Greaves Brewster LLP Copa House Station Road Cheddar, Somerset BS27 3AH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/32] | Lucas, Brian Ronald, et al Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road Warlingham, Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 22154111.3 | 28.01.2022 | [2022/32] | Priority number, date | US202163142751P | 28.01.2021 Original published format: US 202163142751 P | US202217586611 | 27.01.2022 Original published format: US202217586611 | [2022/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4040011 | Date: | 10.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F16F9/34, F16F9/46, B62K25/28, B62K25/30, // F16F9/06 | [2022/32] | CPC: |
F16F9/34 (EP);
B62K25/04 (US);
B62J23/00 (US);
F16F9/46 (EP);
F16K15/182 (US);
F16K27/0209 (US);
B62K2025/044 (EP);
F16F2230/20 (EP);
F16F2230/36 (EP);
F16F9/065 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/12] |
Former [2022/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DÄMPFER MIT EINEM RINGFÖRMIGEN BODENVENTILDURCHFLUSSSYSTEM | [2022/32] | English: | A DAMPER WITH AN ANNULAR BASE VALVE FLOW SYSTEM | [2022/32] | French: | AMORTISSEUR DOTÉ D'UN SYSTÈME D'ÉCOULEMENT DE SOUPAPE À BASE ANNULAIRE | [2022/32] | Examination procedure | 10.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/12] | 10.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2005162004 (SHOWA CORP) [Y] 8,9 * figures 1, 2, 5, 6 *; | [AD]US7374028 (FOX ROBERT C [US]) [AD] 1,7* abstract *; | [XYI]US2014084565 (NAKAMURA HIRONORI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-6,11-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0086] - paragraph [0093] * [Y] 2,8-10 [I] 7; | [YD]US9239090 (MARKING JOHN [US]) [YD] 2 * abstract * * column 4, line 15 - line 24 *; | [XY]EP3064798 (SHOWA CORP [JP]) [X] 1,3,4,6,10-15 * abstract * [Y] 10 | by applicant | US7374028 | US8627932 | US8838335 | US8857580 | US9033122 | US9120362 | US9239090 | US9353818 | US9452654 | US9623716 | US9682604 | US9797467 | US10036443 | US10040329 | US10047817 | US10060499 | US10415662 |