EP4043147 - CLAMPING SYSTEM FOR CLAMPING GRINDING WHEELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.02.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ficai, Giovanni Strada Vicinale di Monte Palero, 1 43038 Sala Baganza (PR) / IT | [2022/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2022/33] | Representative(s) | Corradini, Corrado, et al Ing. C. Corradini & C. S.r.l. Via Dante Alighieri 4 42121 Reggio Emilia / IT | [2022/33] | Application number, filing date | 22154294.7 | 31.01.2022 | [2022/33] | Priority number, date | IT20210003296 | 15.02.2021 Original published format: IT202100003296 | [2022/33] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4043147 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B24B23/02, B24B45/00, B24D5/16, B24D7/16 | [2022/33] | CPC: |
B24B23/022 (EP);
B24D5/16 (EP,US);
B24B45/00 (EP);
B24B45/006 (US);
B24D7/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/11] |
Former [2022/33] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPANNSYSTEM ZUM SPANNEN VON SCHLEIFSCHEIBEN | [2022/33] | English: | CLAMPING SYSTEM FOR CLAMPING GRINDING WHEELS | [2022/33] | French: | SYSTÈME DE SERRAGE DE MEULES | [2022/33] | Examination procedure | 09.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/11] | 09.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]GB1505943 (EDENVALE ENG WORKS [ZA]) [X] 1,4 * p. 1, l. 57-59;; figure 1 * [I] 5; | [A]JPS59118376 (OKUMURA MASAMI) [A] 1-13* figures 1, 3; claim 1 *; | [XI]US4637170 (BLOCK ALECK [US]) [X] 1,2,8,12,13 * c. 1, l. 4-9 c. 3, l. 11-12, l. 37-44 c. 4, l. 3-5, l. 27-29;; figures 1-4 * [I] 3,6,7,9-11 |