EP4046846 - VEHICLE DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.07.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2022/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIZOBATA, Hiroshi Kariya-shi, 448-8651 / JP | [2022/34] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2022/34] | Application number, filing date | 22154462.0 | 01.02.2022 | [2022/34] | Priority number, date | JP20210024193 | 18.02.2021 Original published format: JP 2021024193 | [2022/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4046846 | Date: | 24.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B60K35/00, B60W30/095, B60W50/00, B60W50/14 | [2022/34] | CPC: |
B60K35/00 (EP,US);
G01C21/3626 (CN);
G08G1/167 (US);
B60K35/23 (EP);
B60K35/28 (EP,US);
B60K35/29 (EP);
B60K35/60 (EP);
B60K35/81 (EP,US);
G01C21/3638 (CN);
G01C21/3658 (CN);
B60K2360/167 (EP);
B60K2360/177 (EP,US);
B60K2360/179 (EP);
B60K2360/1868 (EP);
B60K2360/31 (EP);
B60K2360/334 (EP);
B60K2360/785 (EP);
B60K35/22 (US);
B60Y2300/095 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2022/34] | English: | VEHICLE DISPLAY DEVICE | [2022/34] | French: | AFFICHEUR DE VÉHICULE | [2022/34] | Examination procedure | 01.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/34] | 22.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.07.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/33] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]JP2006171950 (DENSO CORP) [X] 1 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0065]; figures 1-6 * [A] 2-8 [Y] 9-11; | [XAY]WO2017082067 (TAYAMA SHUICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0084] - paragraph [0097]; figures 1,2,12 * [A] 2-8[Y] 9-11; | [XAY]US2018058879 (TAYAMA SHUICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0012] - [0028] - [0100] - [0106]; figures 1,2,11A,11B * [A] 2-8 [Y] 9-11 | by applicant | JP2016071666 |