EP4040139 - OPTICAL PROBE FOR ANALYSIS BY FLUORESCENCE IN AQUEOUS MEDIA OF ORGANIC MOLECULES HAVING AT LEAST ONE FLUOROPHORE AND METHOD FOR USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.12.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIAAP 2 rue Jules César 75589 Paris / FR | For all designated states Université Paris-Est Créteil Val de Marne 61 avenue du Général de Gaulle 94010 Creteil Cedex / FR | [2022/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROCHER, Vincent 78570 Andresy / FR | 02 /
VARRAULT, Gilles 94010 Créteil Cedex / FR | 03 /
GOFFIN, Angélique 77165 Cuisy / FR | 04 /
GUERIN, Sabrina 95230 Soisy-Sous-Montmorency / FR | [2022/32] | Representative(s) | Corret, Hélène Cabinet Benech 15, rue d'Astorg 75008 Paris / FR | [2022/32] | Application number, filing date | 22154866.2 | 02.02.2022 | [2022/32] | Priority number, date | FR20210001142 | 05.02.2021 Original published format: FR 2101142 | [2022/32] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4040139 | Date: | 10.08.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4040139 | Date: | 31.01.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/64, G01N33/18, G01N21/15, G01N21/85 | [2022/32] | CPC: |
G01N21/643 (EP);
G01J3/021 (EP);
G01J3/0237 (EP);
G01J3/0297 (EP);
G01J3/32 (EP);
G01J3/42 (EP);
G01N21/645 (EP);
G01N21/8507 (EP);
G01N33/1826 (EP);
G01N33/1886 (EP);
G01J2003/102 (EP);
G01J2003/1213 (EP);
G01J3/4406 (EP);
G01N2021/152 (EP);
G01N2021/6419 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] |
Former [2022/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | OPTISCHE SONDE ZUR FLUORESZENZANALYSE IN WÄSSRIGEN MEDIEN VON ORGANISCHEN MOLEKÜLEN MIT MINDESTENS EINEM FLUOROPHOR UND IHR ANWENDUNGSVERFAHREN | [2022/32] | English: | OPTICAL PROBE FOR ANALYSIS BY FLUORESCENCE IN AQUEOUS MEDIA OF ORGANIC MOLECULES HAVING AT LEAST ONE FLUOROPHORE AND METHOD FOR USING SAME | [2022/32] | French: | SONDE OPTIQUE POUR ANALYSE PAR FLUORESCENCE EN MILIEUX AQUEUX DE MOLÉCULES ORGANIQUES PRÉSENTANT AU MOINS UN FLUOROPHORE ET PROCÉDÉ DE MISE EN OEUVRE | [2022/32] | Examination procedure | 30.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 30.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.01.2024 | BG | 31.01.2024 | FI | 31.01.2024 | HR | 31.01.2024 | LT | 31.01.2024 | LV | 31.01.2024 | NL | 31.01.2024 | PL | 31.01.2024 | SE | 31.01.2024 | NO | 30.04.2024 | RS | 30.04.2024 | GR | 01.05.2024 | IS | 31.05.2024 | PT | 31.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 31.01.2024 | |
BG | 31.01.2024 | ||
FI | 31.01.2024 | ||
HR | 31.01.2024 | ||
LT | 31.01.2024 | ||
LV | 31.01.2024 | ||
NL | 31.01.2024 | ||
PL | 31.01.2024 | ||
NO | 30.04.2024 | ||
RS | 30.04.2024 | ||
GR | 01.05.2024 | ||
IS | 31.05.2024 | ||
PT | 31.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 31.01.2024 | |
BG | 31.01.2024 | ||
FI | 31.01.2024 | ||
HR | 31.01.2024 | ||
LT | 31.01.2024 | ||
NL | 31.01.2024 | ||
NO | 30.04.2024 | ||
RS | 30.04.2024 | ||
GR | 01.05.2024 | ||
IS | 31.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 31.01.2024 | |
NO | 30.04.2024 | ||
IS | 31.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 31.05.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]DE19617106 (LLA UMWELTTECHNISCHE ANALYTIK [DE]) [YD] 11,12 * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 24; figure 1 *; | [Y]US2003062485 (FERNANDEZ SALVADOR M [US], et al) [Y] 6 * figure 5 *; | [Y]JP2003250752 (PENTAX CORP) [Y] 2,6 * abstract *; | [XDY]US2006121614 (TOKHTUEV EUGENE [US], et al) [XD] 1,3-5,7-10,13-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] , [0009] , [0027] - [0029] - [0032] , [0039] , [0048] - [0049] - [0053] , [0055] * [Y] 2,6,11,12; | [A]KR20090081998 (DONG YANG HI TECK CO LTD [KR], et al) [A] 1-15* abstract * | by applicant | DE19617106 | US2006121614 |