Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP4021045 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP4021045



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 869
24.01.2025 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
04.04.2024 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
22.02.2024 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
12.02.2024 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.02.2024 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
12.02.2024 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
12.02.2024 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
25.10.2023 Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
25.10.2023 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
25.10.2023 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
25.10.2023 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
25.10.2023 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 216
25.10.2023 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 216
28.09.2023 Examination started Search / examination 1
21.12.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
21.12.2022 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
21.12.2022 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
21.12.2022 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
21.12.2022 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
21.12.2022 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 6
21.12.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
04.07.2022 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 2
02.06.2022 Refund of fees Search / examination 2
01.06.2022 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
30.05.2022 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
30.05.2022 European search opinion Search / examination 4
30.05.2022 European search report Search / examination 2
30.05.2022 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
03.02.2022 Abstract Search / examination 1
03.02.2022 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
03.02.2022 Claims Search / examination 3
03.02.2022 Description Search / examination 144
03.02.2022 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
03.02.2022 Drawings Search / examination 71
03.02.2022 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
01.09.2015 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 153