Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11738952 | Global Dossier | 29.08.2023 | B2 | US2022242675 | 04.08.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202163145133 | 03.02.2021 | US202217591996 | 03.02.2022 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4039620 | Global Dossier | 10.08.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202163145133 | 03.02.2021 |