EP4049697 - PERISTALTIC INFUSION PUMP TUBE SEGMENT AND INFUSION PUMP DEVICE WITH SUCH A TUBE SEGMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.07.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Micrel Medical Devices S.A. Konstantinoupoleos 42 Karela Industrial Area 19441 Koropi / GR | [2022/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsoukalis, Achilleas Papagou 15669 Attiki / GR | [2022/35] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1 20355 Hamburg / DE | [2022/35] | Application number, filing date | 22155268.0 | 04.02.2022 | [2022/35] | Priority number, date | EP20210020053 | 04.02.2021 Original published format: EP 21020053 | [2022/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4049697 | Date: | 31.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4049697 | Date: | 04.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/142, A61M39/08, F04B43/00, F04B43/08, A61J1/06, A61J1/10, // A61M5/36, A61M5/168 | [2023/01] | CPC: |
A61M5/14228 (EP,US);
A61M5/142 (US);
A61M39/08 (EP);
A61M5/002 (US);
A61M5/14 (EP);
A61M5/14244 (EP);
A61M5/165 (US);
A61M5/16854 (EP,US);
F04B43/0072 (EP);
F04B43/08 (US);
F04B43/082 (EP);
A61M2005/1405 (EP);
A61M2005/14208 (EP,US);
A61M2005/14268 (EP);
A61M2005/14272 (EP);
A61M2005/16868 (US);
A61M2005/16872 (EP,US);
A61M2202/048 (US);
A61M2205/17 (EP);
A61M2205/18 (EP);
A61M2205/3351 (EP);
A61M2205/3355 (EP);
A61M2205/3375 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3553 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3584 (EP);
A61M2205/502 (EP,US);
A61M2205/52 (EP);
A61M2205/6009 (EP);
A61M2205/6018 (EP);
A61M2205/6054 (EP);
A61M2205/6072 (EP,US);
A61M5/1411 (EP);
A61M5/14232 (EP);
A61M5/365 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/35] | A61M5/142, A61M39/08, F04B43/00, F04B43/08, // A61M5/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/32] |
Former [2022/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHLAUCHSEGMENT EINER PERISTALTISCHEN INFUSIONSPUMPE UND INFUSIONSPUMPENVORRICHTUNG MIT EINEM SOLCHEN SCHLAUCHSEGMENT | [2022/35] | English: | PERISTALTIC INFUSION PUMP TUBE SEGMENT AND INFUSION PUMP DEVICE WITH SUCH A TUBE SEGMENT | [2022/35] | French: | SEGMENT DE TUBE DE POMPE À PERFUSION PÉRISTALTIQUE ET DISPOSITIF DE POMPE À PERFUSION DOTÉ D'UN TEL SEGMENT DE TUBE | [2022/35] | Examination procedure | 04.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/32] | 04.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.07.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 04.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 04.10.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 04.10.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.10.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5088522 (RATH DIETER [DE], et al) [A] 1-23 * column 4, lines 19-25; figures 3-5 *; | [XA]WO9428309 (TAMARI YEHUDA [US]) [X] 1-5 * page 26, line 39 - page 29, line 10; figure 8a * [A] 6-23; | [AD]EP0858812 (MICREL MICROELECTRONIC APPLIC [GR]) [AD] 18-20 * column 4, lines 14-18; figures 2,3 *; | [XI]US6203528 (DECKERT CLINTON L [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * column 16, line 51 - column 18, line 31; figures 16-22 * [I] 9-23; | [A]US2009053084 (KLEIN JEFFREY A [US]) [A] 1-23 * paragraphs [0125] , [0135]; figures 1-3D *; | [A]EP2075468 (AUTOMATION PARTNERSHIP [GB]) [A] 1-23 * paragraphs [0004] , [0024] , [0041]; figure 17 *; | [A]WO2011008624 (NESTEC SA [CH], et al) [A] 1-23 * paragraphs [0412] , [0413] , [0431] , [0432] , [0449] , [0450] , [0468] , [0469] , [0486] - [0488]; figures 33,50,51,55-60 *; | [XD]EP2659923 (MICREL MEDICAL DEVICES S A [GR]) [XD] 24* paragraphs [0020] - [0023] - [0036] , [0 37] , [0 46] * | by applicant | EP0858812 | EP2659923 |