EP4046488 - DEVICE FOR CONTACTING A VOLTAGE-CARRYING LINE OF A SMALL ANIMAL DETERRENT, AND SMALL ANIMAL DETERRENT WITH SUCH A DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Norbert Schaub GmbH Robert-Koch-Strasse 20 79395 Neuenburg am Rhein / DE | [2022/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schelb, Hans-Jörg 79219 Staufen / DE | [2022/34] | Representative(s) | RACKETTE Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 13 10 79013 Freiburg / DE | [2022/34] | Application number, filing date | 22155376.1 | 07.02.2022 | [2022/34] | Priority number, date | DE202110104235 | 23.02.2021 Original published format: DE102021104235 | [2022/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4046488 | Date: | 24.08.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4046488 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A01M29/24 | [2022/34] | CPC: |
A01M29/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/10] |
Former [2022/34] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM KONTAKTIEREN EINER SPANNUNGSFÜHRENDEN LEITUNG EINER KLEINTIERABWEHREINRICHTUNG UND MIT EINER DERARTIGEN VORRICHTUNG AUSGESTATTETE KLEINTIERABWEHREINRICHTUNG | [2022/34] | English: | DEVICE FOR CONTACTING A VOLTAGE-CARRYING LINE OF A SMALL ANIMAL DETERRENT, AND SMALL ANIMAL DETERRENT WITH SUCH A DEVICE | [2022/34] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR METTRE EN CONTACT UN CONDUCTEUR SOUS TENSION D'UN DISPOSITIF DE PROTECTION CONTRE LES PETITS ANIMAUX ET DISPOSITIF DE PROTECTION CONTRE LES PETITS ANIMAUX ÉQUIPÉ D'UN TEL DISPOSITIF | [2022/34] | Examination procedure | 27.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/10] | 27.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/40] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 25.10.2023 | ES | 25.10.2023 | HR | 25.10.2023 | RO | 25.10.2023 | RS | 25.10.2023 | SK | 25.10.2023 | SM | 25.10.2023 | NO | 25.01.2024 | GR | 26.01.2024 | IS | 25.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 25.10.2023 | |
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
RO | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 25.10.2023 | |
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | ES | 25.10.2023 | |
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 26.01.2024 | |
IS | 25.02.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE202005003756U (KEMO ELECTRONIC [DE]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]DE202010003007U (KERNCHEN KLAUS [DE]) [A] 1,12* abstract *; | [A]DE102014016797 (NORBERT SCHAUB GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]DE102014000957 (HJH TRADING AG [CH]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * | by applicant | DE2639044 | US5041013 | US5690505 | DE202005003756U | DE202010003007U | DE102014000957 | DE102014016797 | DE202014011452U |