EP4224009 - BLADE SEGMENT FOR A ROTOR BLADE OF A WIND TURBINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.07.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LM Wind Power A/S Jupitervej 6 6000 Kolding / DK | [2023/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Scholte-Wassink, Hartmut 48499 Salzbergen / DE | [2023/32] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2023/32] | Application number, filing date | 22155413.2 | 07.02.2022 | [2023/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4224009 | Date: | 09.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F03D1/06, F03D7/02 | [2023/32] | CPC: |
F03D1/0658 (EP);
F03D1/0677 (EP);
F05B2230/60 (EP);
Y02E10/72 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/12] |
Former [2023/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHAUFELSEGMENT FÜR EINE ROTORSCHAUFEL EINER WINDTURBINE | [2023/32] | English: | BLADE SEGMENT FOR A ROTOR BLADE OF A WIND TURBINE | [2023/32] | French: | SEGMENT D'UNE PALE DE ROTOR D'ÉOLIENNE | [2023/32] | Examination procedure | 09.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/12] | 09.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2010254813 (DAWSON MARK [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figure - *; | [A]US10988351 (AITKEN GLEN D [CA], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract ** figure - *; | [X]US11118574 (BAKER JONATHON PAUL [US]) [X] 1-15 * column 4, line 45 - column 12, line 63 * * figure - * |