Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP4036731 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP4036731



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 473
09.02.2024 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
07.12.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
07.12.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
07.12.2023 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
07.12.2023 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
07.12.2023 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
18.04.2023 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
10.03.2023 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
21.02.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
21.02.2023 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
21.02.2023 French translation of claims Search / examination 6
21.02.2023 German translation of the claims Search / examination 5
21.02.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
05.12.2022 Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
05.12.2022 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
05.12.2022 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
05.12.2022 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
05.12.2022 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 73
05.12.2022 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 73
05.10.2022 Examination started Search / examination 1
22.08.2022 Refund of fees Search / examination 2
17.08.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
17.08.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
17.08.2022 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
11.08.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.08.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
11.08.2022 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
08.08.2022 Information about publication, reminder payment of designation fee, response to extended European search report, if applicable Search / examination 2
19.07.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
19.07.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
19.07.2022 Written request for examination Search / examination 1
06.07.2022 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
04.07.2022 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
04.07.2022 European search opinion Search / examination 1
04.07.2022 European search report Search / examination 2
04.07.2022 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
21.02.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
21.02.2022 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
21.02.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
21.02.2022 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
17.02.2022 Deficiency in designation of inventor Search / examination 1
07.02.2022 Abstract Search / examination 1
07.02.2022 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
07.02.2022 Claims Search / examination 5
07.02.2022 Description Search / examination 62
07.02.2022 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
07.02.2022 Drawings Search / examination 13
07.02.2022 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
01.03.2017 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 79
01.03.2017 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 94