EP4039561 - STEERING APPARATUS INCLUDING STEERING WHEEL OF SMART MOBILITY VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hyundai Mobis Co., Ltd. 203, Teheran-ro Gangnam-gu Seoul 06141 / KR | [2022/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AHN, Sung Joon 13175 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
LEE, Seung Hwan 18459 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
KIM, Tae Hun 13589 Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2022/32] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2022/32] | Application number, filing date | 22155875.2 | 09.02.2022 | [2022/32] | Priority number, date | KR20210018691 | 09.02.2021 Original published format: KR 20210018691 | [2022/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4039561 | Date: | 10.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4039561 | Date: | 02.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4039561 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B62D1/18 | [2022/32] | CPC: |
B62D1/18 (EP,KR);
B62D1/04 (CN,US);
B62D1/184 (CN,KR,US);
B60K23/00 (US);
B60K35/00 (EP);
B60K35/10 (EP);
B60K35/22 (EP);
B60K35/23 (EP);
B60K35/28 (EP);
B60K35/60 (EP);
B60Q1/268 (EP);
B60Q1/547 (EP);
B62D1/043 (KR);
B62D1/046 (KR);
B62D1/183 (EP);
B60K2360/1523 (EP);
B60K2360/161 (EP);
B60K2360/178 (EP);
B60K2360/334 (EP);
B60K2360/66 (EP);
B60K2360/785 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/18] |
Former [2022/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | LENKVORRICHTUNG MIT LENKRAD EINES INTELLIGENTEN MOBILITÄTSFAHRZEUGS | [2022/32] | English: | STEERING APPARATUS INCLUDING STEERING WHEEL OF SMART MOBILITY VEHICLE | [2022/32] | French: | APPAREIL DE DIRECTION COMPRENANT UN VOLANT DE DIRECTION DE VÉHICULE DE MOBILITÉ INTELLIGENT | [2022/32] | Examination procedure | 09.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/32] | 24.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1571064 (ITALDESIGN GIUGIARO SPA [IT]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE102016210622 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0016] ** paragraph [0018] *; | [A]US10577012 (DEKKER JASPER [GB], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP3712035 (VOLVO CAR CORP [SE]) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0032]; figures 1,2,3,8 * |