03.10.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] |
22.08.2024 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] |
02.08.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] |
26.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] |
12.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] |
31.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] |
19.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
12.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
15.09.2023 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 18.10.2023 [2023/42] |
15.09.2023 |
Change - applicant |
published on 18.10.2023 [2023/42] |
08.09.2023 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
07.09.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
07.09.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
02.05.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
18.11.2022 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
18.11.2022 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 21.12.2022 [2022/51] |
18.11.2022 |
Change - designated states |
published on 21.12.2022 [2022/51] |
16.11.2022 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
29.07.2022 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 31.08.2022 [2022/35] |
11.02.2022 |
Change - representative |
|