EP4228172 - METHOD FOR AN ARBITRARY WAVEFORM MEASUREMENT AND A SYSTEM TO OPERATE SAID METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.08.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.02.2024 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.07.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Karlsruher Institut für Technologie Kaiserstrasse 12 76131 Karlsruhe / DE | [2023/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koos, Prof. Dr. Christian 74936 Siegelsbach / DE | 02 /
Fang, Dengyang 76131 Karlsruhe / DE | 03 /
Drayß, Daniel 76137 Karlsruhe / DE | [2023/33] | Application number, filing date | 22156379.4 | 11.02.2022 | [2023/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4228172 | Date: | 16.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/07, G01J11/00, H04B10/61, H04B17/20 | [2023/33] | CPC: |
H04B10/07 (EP);
G01J9/04 (EP);
H04B10/61 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/11] |
Former [2023/33] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MESSUNG EINER BELIEBIGEN WELLENFORM UND SYSTEM ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS | [2023/33] | English: | METHOD FOR AN ARBITRARY WAVEFORM MEASUREMENT AND A SYSTEM TO OPERATE SAID METHOD | [2023/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE DE FORME D'ONDE ARBITRAIRE ET SYSTÈME DE FONCTIONNEMENT DUDIT PROCÉDÉ | [2023/33] | Examination procedure | 07.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/11] | 07.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.08.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2021257603 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]); |