EP4062946 - FURNITURE WITH A FURNITURE BODY AND A MOVABLE FURNITURE PART [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.07.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Grass GmbH Grass Platz 1 6973 Höchst / AT | [2022/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mittwoch, Stephan 6890 Lustenau / AT | 02 /
Grabher, Günter 6972 Fußach / AT | [2022/39] | Representative(s) | Otten, Roth, Dobler & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Großtobeler Straße 39 88276 Berg / Ravensburg / DE | [2022/39] | Application number, filing date | 22156928.8 | 16.02.2022 | [2022/39] | Priority number, date | DE202120101546U | 24.03.2021 Original published format: DE 202021101546 U | [2022/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4062946 | Date: | 28.09.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4062946 | Date: | 11.01.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61L2/10, A47B88/919 | [2022/39] | CPC: |
A61L2/10 (EP);
A47B2220/0077 (EP);
A47B88/40 (EP);
A61L2202/121 (EP);
A61L2202/122 (EP);
A61L2202/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/32] |
Former [2022/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MÖBEL MIT EINEM MÖBELKORPUS UND EINEM BEWEGLICHEN MÖBELTEIL | [2022/39] | English: | FURNITURE WITH A FURNITURE BODY AND A MOVABLE FURNITURE PART | [2022/39] | French: | MEUBLE DOTÉ D'UN CORPS DE MEUBLE ET D'UNE PARTIE MOBILE DE MEUBLE | [2022/39] | Examination procedure | 06.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/32] | 06.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]KR20170041947 (SEOUL VIOSYS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,2,4-9,11,12 * siehe insbesondere die Abb. 1-2, 4, 9-10 und die entsprechenden Textabschnitte *; | [XI]CN107432573 (WUXI GUANGYI CENTRAL PRIMARY SCHOOL) [X] 1,4-9 * esp fig. 1 and corresponding text passages * [I] 2,11,12; | [X]CN108404145 (CHENGDU FEISIPU SCIENCE & TECH CO LTD) [X] 1,3,10,13 * siehe insbesondere die Abb. 1 u. 7 und die entsprechenden Textabschnitte *; | [X]CN110710802 (ZHEJIANG JINIYA SMART HOME CO LTD) [X] 1,10,13 * siehe insbesondere die Abb. 1-2 und die entsprechenden Textabschnitte *; | [X]CN110755656 (GUANGZHOU SANLE ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION TECH CO LTD) [X] 1,3,10,13 * siehe insbesondere die Abb. 1-2 u. 4 und die entsprechenden Textabschnitte *; | [X]CN111202370 (UNIV JILIN NORMAL) [X] 1,10,13 * siehe insbesondere die Abb. 1-2 und die entsprechenden Textabschnitte *; | [X]CN210989061U (UNIV HEILONGJIANG TECHNOLOGY) [X] 1,10,13 * siehe insbesondere die Abb. 1 und die entsprechenden Textabschnitte *; | [X]CN111513474 (UNIV SHANGHAI ENG SCIENCE) [X] 1,10,13 * siehe insbesondere die Abb. 11 und die entsprechenden Textabschnitte *; | [X]CN211911023U (GUANGZHOU NOBEE HOUSEHOLD CO LTD) [X] 1,10,13 * siehe insbesondere die Abb. 2-3 und die entsprechenden Textabschnitte *; | [X]CN212014957U (UNIV HUNAN SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY, et al) [X] 1,3,10,13* siehe insbesondere die Abb. 1 u. 3 und die entsprechenden Textabschnitte *; | [XI]DE202021100344U (OXTI CORP [TW]) [X] 1,2,4-9 * siehe insbesondere die Abb. 1-2 und die entsprechenden Textabschnitte * [I] 11,12 |