Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
27.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
05.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant | |
02.02.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
02.02.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] |
02.02.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] |
29.09.2023 | Change - inventor | published on 01.11.2023 [2023/44] |
21.07.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 23.08.2023 [2023/34] |
20.02.2022 | Change - representative |