EP4231263 - PREMISES SECURITY MONITORING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.07.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Verisure Sàrl Chemin Jean-Baptiste Vandelle 3/3A 1290 Versoix / CH | [2023/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TORRES MONTERO, Pablo 28224 Pozuelo de Alarcón, Madrid / ES | 02 /
HACKETT, Nicholas 1290 Versoix, Geneva / CH | 03 /
PIEDBOIS, Julien 1290 Versoix, Geneva / CH | 04 /
MÅNSSON, Bo-Erik 21119 Malmö / SE | [2023/44] |
Former [2023/34] | 01 /
TORRES MONTERO, Pablo 28224 Pozuelo de Alarcó, Madrid / ES | ||
02 /
HACKETT, Nicholas 1290 Versoix, Geneva / CH | |||
03 /
PIEDBOIS, Julien 1290 Versoix, Geneva / CH | |||
04 /
MÅNSSON, Bo-Erik 21119 Malmö / SE | Representative(s) | Prinz & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [2023/34] | Application number, filing date | 22157535.0 | 18.02.2022 | [2023/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4231263 | Date: | 23.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G08B13/24, G08B29/18, G08B25/00 | [2023/34] | CPC: |
G08B13/2491 (EP);
G08B25/002 (EP);
G08B29/181 (EP);
G08B29/188 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/10] |
Former [2023/34] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSÜBERWACHUNGSSYSTEM FÜR RÄUME | [2023/34] | English: | PREMISES SECURITY MONITORING SYSTEM | [2023/34] | French: | SYSTÈME DE SURVEILLANCE DE SÉCURITÉ DE LOCAUX | [2023/34] | Examination procedure | 01.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/10] | 01.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2020039040 (VERISURE SARL [CH]); | [A]US2021136681 (MAI CHAO-LUN [US], et al); | [A]US2021360533 (NEERBEK JAN [DK], et al); | by applicant | WO2020039044 |