EP4040843 - RADIO COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, BASE STATION AND COMMUNICATION TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORPORATION 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2022/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAZAWA, Masayuki Tokyo, 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
SUZUKI, Kuniyuki Tokyo, 100-8310 / JP | 03 /
MOCHIZUKI, Mitsuru Tokyo, 100-8310 / JP | 04 /
ONO, Koji Tokyo, 100-8310 / JP | 05 /
NONAMI, Takayuki Tokyo, 100-8310 / JP | 06 /
TOMOE, Naohito Tokyo, 100-8310 / JP | 07 /
HASEGAWA, Fumiki Tokyo, 100-8310 / JP | [2022/32] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/32] | Sajda, Wolf E. Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 22157707.5 | 26.10.2015 | [2022/32] | Priority number, date | JP20140223406 | 31.10.2014 Original published format: JP 2014223406 | [2022/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4040843 | Date: | 10.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W28/06, H04J11/00, H04W72/04, H04L5/00 | [2022/32] | CPC: |
H04L27/26 (EP,US);
H04W72/51 (US);
H04J11/00 (EP,US);
H04L5/0007 (EP,US);
H04W28/06 (EP,US);
H04W72/04 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/11] |
Former [2022/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FUNKKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM, BASISSTATION UND KOMMUNIKATIONSENDGERÄT | [2022/32] | English: | RADIO COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, BASE STATION AND COMMUNICATION TERMINAL | [2022/32] | French: | SYSTÈME DE RADIOCOMMUNICATION, STATION DE BASE ET TERMINAL DE COMMUNICATION | [2022/32] | Examination procedure | 21.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/32] | 09.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15854122.7 / EP3214869 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2005180313 (KIM YUNG-SOO [KR], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6 * paragraphs [0048] - [0064]; figures 2,3 * [A] 4; | [XA]WO2014088195 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1,6,7 * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0114] *[A] 2-5 | by applicant | - 3GPP TS 36.300 | - 3GPP TS 36.304 | - 3GPP Sl-083461 | - 3GPP R2-082899 | - 3GPP TR 36.814 | - 3GPP TR 36.912 | - 3GPP TR 36.819 | - 3GPP TS 36.141 | - 3GPP Rl-134496 | - 3GPP Rl-132236 | - 3GPP TR 36.842 | - "Scenarios, requirements and KPIs for 5G mobile and wireless system", ICT-317669-METIS/D1.1, (20130430), URL: https://www.metis2020.com/documents/deliverables/ | - 3GPP TS36.300 |