EP4230331 - GRADUATED DRILLING TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.07.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RANIT-Befestigungssysteme GmbH Lennestrasse 5 45701 Herten / DE | [2023/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Giertulla, Roger 44651 Herne / DE | 02 /
Gräwe, Bernd 45701 Herten / DE | [2023/34] | Representative(s) | Kohlmann, Kai Donatusstraße 1 52078 Aachen / DE | [2023/34] | Application number, filing date | 22157784.4 | 21.02.2022 | [2023/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4230331 | Date: | 23.08.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B23B51/08, B25D17/02, B25D17/08, // B23B49/00 | [2023/34] | CPC: |
B25D17/088 (EP);
B23B51/08 (EP);
B25D17/02 (EP);
B23B2226/39 (EP);
B23B2226/75 (EP);
B23B49/005 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/48] |
Former [2023/34] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STUFENBOHRWERKZEUG | [2023/34] | English: | GRADUATED DRILLING TOOL | [2023/34] | French: | OUTIL DE PERÇAGE ÉTAGÉ | [2023/34] | Examination procedure | 19.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.10.2023 | Examination requested [2023/48] | 20.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]DE202008011892U (SCHLAGMANN BAUSTOFFWERKE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1,2,4-10 * the whole document * [A] 3; | [A]EP2959995 (EJOT BAUBEFESTIGUNGEN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2547627 (JENS POLANETZ-OTTO [DE], et al) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [Y]WO2019074871 (MILWAUKEE ELECTRIC TOOL CORP [US]) [Y] 1,2,5-10 * the whole document *; | [A]CN110202189 (SUZHOU MAIKAFU INDUSTRIAL TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2021021858 (MILWAUKEE ELECTRIC TOOL CORP [US]) [Y] 1,4-10 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE29508159U |