EP4052818 - RECOATER FOR ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.03.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2022/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van Deest, Ryan William Cincinnati, 45215 / US | 02 /
Simmermon, David Scott Cincinnati, 45215 / US | 03 /
Dodds, Nicholas Ryan Cincinnati, 45215 / US | 04 /
Shalaby, Mohammed Mounir Cincinnati, 45215 / US | [2022/36] | Representative(s) | Hafner & Kohl PartmbB Schleiermacherstraße 25 90491 Nürnberg / DE | [2022/36] | Application number, filing date | 22157975.8 | 22.02.2022 | [2022/36] | Priority number, date | US202117189959 | 02.03.2021 Original published format: US202117189959 | [2022/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4052818 | Date: | 07.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B22F10/20, B22F12/67, B29C64/153, B29C64/214, B33Y10/00, B33Y30/00, B33Y40/00 | [2022/36] | CPC: |
B22F10/28 (EP);
B22F12/67 (EP,US);
B22F10/31 (EP);
B22F10/50 (US);
B22F10/85 (US);
B22F12/90 (EP);
B29C64/214 (EP,US);
B29C64/393 (US);
B33Y10/00 (EP,US);
B33Y30/00 (EP,US);
B33Y40/00 (EP,US);
B33Y50/02 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B22F2999/00, B22F10/31, B22F12/60 (EP);
B22F2999/00, B22F12/60, B22F12/70, B22F10/322, B22F10/32 (EP);
B22F2999/00, B22F12/67, B22F12/52 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/15] |
Former [2022/36] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WIEDERBESCHICHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR DIE GENERATIVE FERTIGUNG | [2022/36] | English: | RECOATER FOR ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING | [2022/36] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RÉ-ENDUCTION POUR LA FABRICATION ADDITIVE | [2022/36] | Examination procedure | 07.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/15] | 07.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN206573076U (BEIJING HUSUN TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-19 * abstract * * figures 1,2 *; | [I]EP3473440 (CL SCHUTZRECHTSVERWALTUNGS GMBH [DE]) [I] 1-5 * paragraphs [0001] , [0005] - [0007] - [0014] - [0018] - [0020] , [0021] , [0040] , [0041] , [0044] , [0045] * * figures 1-5 *; | [XI]EP3536484 (CL SCHUTZRECHTSVERWALTUNGS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,6,7,10,11,15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0005] , [0006] , [0010] , [0011] , [0016] , [0017] , [0024] - [0035] - [0041] - [0047] - [0056] - [0061] * * figures 1-4 * [I] 2-5,8,9,12-14,16-19; | [A]US2020376761 (SWEETLAND MATTHEW [US]) [A] 1-19* the whole document *; | [A]EP3771508 (HAMILTON SUNDSTRAND CORP [US]) [A] 1-19 * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] - [0005] , [0020] , [0034] * * figures 1-10 * |