EP4123386 - POWDER CONTAINER AND IMAGE FORMING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LV, PL, PT, SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2023/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KITAMURA, Gen Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2023/43] |
Former [2023/04] | 01 /
KITAMURA, Gen Tokyo, 143-8555 / JP | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2023/04] | Application number, filing date | 22158185.3 | 23.02.2022 | [2023/04] | Priority number, date | JP20210061010 | 31.03.2021 Original published format: JP 2021061010 | [2023/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4123386 | Date: | 25.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4123386 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/08 | [2023/04] | CPC: |
G03G15/0872 (EP);
G03G15/0867 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/04] | Title | German: | PULVERBEHÄLTER UND BILDERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2023/04] | English: | POWDER CONTAINER AND IMAGE FORMING APPARATUS | [2023/04] | French: | CONTENEUR DE POUDRE ET APPAREIL DE FORMATION D'IMAGES | [2023/04] | Examination procedure | 23.02.2022 | Examination requested [2023/04] | 11.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 29.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.02.2024 | BG | 07.02.2024 | ES | 07.02.2024 | FI | 07.02.2024 | HR | 07.02.2024 | LT | 07.02.2024 | LV | 07.02.2024 | PL | 07.02.2024 | SE | 07.02.2024 | NO | 07.05.2024 | RS | 07.05.2024 | GR | 08.05.2024 | IS | 07.06.2024 | PT | 07.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 07.02.2024 | |
BG | 07.02.2024 | ||
ES | 07.02.2024 | ||
FI | 07.02.2024 | ||
HR | 07.02.2024 | ||
LT | 07.02.2024 | ||
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
RS | 07.05.2024 | ||
GR | 08.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 07.02.2024 | |
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 07.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5598254 (IKESUE MASUMI [JP], et al) [X] 2,4-6,8,10-15 * column 10, line 29 - column 11, line 20; figure 17F *; | [A]US5866419 (MEDER MARTIN G [US]) [A] 1,3-15 * abstract *; | [X]US2003133722 (KAIHO SATOSHI [JP]) [X] 2,4-6,8,10-15* paragraph [0045]; figure 2 *; | [A]EP2058709 (KYOCERA MITA CORP [JP]) [A] 1,3-15 * paragraphs [0030] - [0043]; figures 2,4 *; | [AD]JP2017173501 (KONICA MINOLTA INC) [AD] 1,3-15 * abstract * | by applicant | JP2017173501 |