EP4067045 - INJECTION MOLDING MACHINE, CONTROL DEVICE FOR INJECTION MOLDING MACHINE, AND CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.09.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD. 1-1, Osaki 2-Chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-6025 / JP | [2022/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWAGUCHI, Tatsuya Chiba, 263-0001 / JP | [2022/40] | Representative(s) | Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz Patentanwälte Postfach 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | [2022/40] | Application number, filing date | 22158200.0 | 23.02.2022 | [2022/40] | Priority number, date | JP20210062315 | 31.03.2021 Original published format: JP 2021062315 | [2022/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4067045 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/78 | [2022/40] | CPC: |
B29C45/78 (EP,CN);
B29C45/74 (CN);
B29C45/76 (CN);
B29C2945/7604 (EP);
B29C2945/7619 (EP);
B29C2945/76367 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPRITZGIESSMASCHINE, STEUERVORRICHTUNG FÜR SPRITZGIESSMASCHINE UND STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2022/40] | English: | INJECTION MOLDING MACHINE, CONTROL DEVICE FOR INJECTION MOLDING MACHINE, AND CONTROL METHOD | [2022/40] | French: | MACHINE DE MOULAGE PAR INJECTION, DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE POUR MACHINE DE MOULAGE PAR INJECTION, ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE | [2022/40] | Examination procedure | 23.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/40] | 10.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004166188 (UCHIYAMA TATSUHIRO [JP], et al); | [Y]JP3794610B ; | [A]US2009208600 (AKAMATSU MASAHARU [CN]); | [XY]EP3100840 (SUMITOMO HEAVY INDUSTRIES [JP]); | [A]EP3389980 (IMFLUX INC [US]); | [Y]JP2018165033 (SUMITOMO HEAVY INDUSTRIES) | by applicant | JP2004195879 |