EP4030729 - ROUTER WITH BILATERAL TCP SESSION MONITORING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.01.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 128 Technology, Inc. 200 Wheeler Road Burlington, MA 01803 / US | [2022/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JAFFER, Sarah V Billerica, 01821 / US | 02 /
MENON, Abilash Boxborough, 01719 / US | 03 /
YUNGELSON, Anna Lexington, 02421 / US | 04 /
TIMMONS, Patrick Newton, 02461 / US | [2022/29] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/29] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 22158329.7 | 22.09.2017 | [2022/29] | Priority number, date | US201615283946 | 03.10.2016 Original published format: US201615283946 | [2022/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4030729 | Date: | 20.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L45/00, H04L45/021 | [2022/29] | CPC: |
H04L45/22 (EP,US);
H04L45/70 (EP);
H04L67/142 (US);
H04L67/561 (US);
H04L69/16 (US);
H04L45/021 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/08] |
Former [2022/29] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ROUTER MIT DOPPELSEITIGER TCP-SITZUNGSÜBERWACHUNG | [2022/29] | English: | ROUTER WITH BILATERAL TCP SESSION MONITORING | [2022/29] | French: | ROUTEUR AVEC SURVEILLANCE DE SESSION TCP BILATÉRALE | [2022/29] | Examination procedure | 13.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/08] | 13.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17858900.8 / EP3520267 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2004073655 (KAN CHAO [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,7,13-15 * figures 5,7,8 * * paragraphs [0006] , [0007] , [0021] , [0023] , [0027] , [0030] , [0031] , [0033] , [0035] , [0037] , [0039] , [0 40] , [0 46] * [I] 4,5,8-12; | [I]US2011270983 (DE FORT-MENARES ULRICA [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * figures 1-3 ** paragraphs [0013] - [0030] * |