EP4235453 - METHOD FOR CREATING AN INDEX FOR REPORTING LARGE-SCALE VARIANT CLUSTERINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.07.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 08.03.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | 08.03.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Celonis SE Theresienstrasse 6 80333 München / DE | [2023/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thiel, Konstantin Emil 1220 Wien / AT | 02 /
Augsten, Nikolaus 5020 Salzburg / AT | 03 /
Kocher, Daniel 5301 Eugendorf / AT | 04 /
Mann, Willi 82031 Grünwald / DE | [2023/35] | Representative(s) | 2s-ip Schramm Schneider Bertagnoll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Part mbB Postfach 86 02 67 81629 München / DE | [2023/35] | Application number, filing date | 22158513.6 | 24.02.2022 | [2023/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4235453 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F16/2458 | [2023/35] | CPC: |
G06F16/2465 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/15] |
Former [2023/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINES INDEX ZUM MELDEN VON GROSSSKALIGEN VARIANTENCLUSTERN | [2023/35] | English: | METHOD FOR CREATING AN INDEX FOR REPORTING LARGE-SCALE VARIANT CLUSTERINGS | [2023/35] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CRÉATION D'UN INDICE PERMETTANT DE DÉCLARER DES REGROUPEMENTS DE VARIANTS À GRANDE ÉCHELLE | [2023/35] | Examination procedure | 29.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/15] | 29.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ID] - ANKERST M ET AL, "OPTICS: ordering points to identify the clustering structure", SIGMOD RECORD, ACM, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19990601), vol. 28, no. 2, ISSN 0163-5808, pages 49 - 60, XP008144377 [ID] 1-15 * page 51, column r, lines 10-12 * * page 52, column r, lines 2-48 * * page 53, column l, line 1 - page 54, line 24 * * figures 5-8 * | [AD] - ESTER et al., A Density-Based Algorithm for Discovering Clusters in Large Spatial Databases with Noise, Proceedings of the Second International Conference on Knowledge Discovery and Data Mining, AAAI Press, (1996), pages 226 - 231, XP002807060 [AD] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | - ESTER et al., A Density-Based Algorithm for Discovering Clusters in Large Spatial Databases with Noise, Proceedings of the Second International Conference on Knowledge Discovery and Data Mining, AAAI Press, (19960000), pages 226 - 231 | - ANKERST et al., "OPTICS: Ordering Points to Identify the Clustering Structure", Proceedings of ACM SIGMOD Int. Conf. on Management of Data, (19990000), vol. 28, pages 49 - 60, XP008144377 |