EP4063154 - LOWER STRUCTURE OF ELECTRIC VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, SK | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAZDA MOTOR CORPORATION 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | [2023/46] |
Former [2022/39] | For all designated states MAZDA MOTOR CORPORATION 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sato, Masanao Hiroshima, 730-8670 / JP | 02 /
Noguchi, Katsutoshi Hiroshima, 730-8670 / JP | 03 /
Murakami, Tomokazu Hiroshima, 730-8670 / JP | 04 /
Kawaguchi, Yudai Hiroshima, 730-8670 / JP | [2022/39] | Representative(s) | Thoma, Michael Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [2022/39] | Application number, filing date | 22158693.6 | 25.02.2022 | [2022/39] | Priority number, date | JP20210053425 | 26.03.2021 Original published format: JP 2021053425 | [2022/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4063154 | Date: | 28.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4063154 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B60K1/00, B60K1/04, B62D25/20 | [2022/39] | CPC: |
B60K1/00 (EP,US);
B62D25/20 (CN);
B62D21/11 (US);
B60K1/04 (EP,CN,US);
B60K11/02 (CN,US);
B60K5/00 (US);
B60L15/007 (CN);
B60R16/0215 (CN,US);
H05K7/20927 (CN);
B60K2001/003 (EP);
B60K2001/005 (US);
B60K2001/006 (US);
B60K2001/0438 (EP,CN,US);
B60Y2400/61 (EP);
B60Y2410/115 (EP);
B62D25/2045 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/18] |
Former [2022/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | UNTERSTRUKTUR EINES ELEKTRISCHEN FAHRZEUGS | [2022/39] | English: | LOWER STRUCTURE OF ELECTRIC VEHICLE | [2022/39] | French: | STRUCTURE BASSE DU VÉHICULE ÉLECTRIQUE | [2022/39] | Examination procedure | 28.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/18] | 28.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.11.2023 | CZ | 15.11.2023 | DK | 15.11.2023 | EE | 15.11.2023 | ES | 15.11.2023 | HR | 15.11.2023 | IT | 15.11.2023 | LT | 15.11.2023 | LV | 15.11.2023 | NL | 15.11.2023 | PL | 15.11.2023 | RO | 15.11.2023 | RS | 15.11.2023 | SE | 15.11.2023 | SK | 15.11.2023 | SM | 15.11.2023 | BG | 15.02.2024 | NO | 15.02.2024 | GR | 16.02.2024 | IS | 15.03.2024 | PT | 15.03.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
CZ | 15.11.2023 | ||
DK | 15.11.2023 | ||
EE | 15.11.2023 | ||
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RO | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
DK | 15.11.2023 | ||
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 15.11.2023 | |
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 16.02.2024 | |
IS | 15.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US7896115 (ONO TOHRU [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [A]US2011168468 (TAGUCHI TOMOO [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract ** paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0118] *; | [A]US2017232866 (SUGIZAKI TETSUYA [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0070] *; | [AD]JP2019188899 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [AD] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0037] *; | [AD]JP2020172879 (MAZDA MOTOR) [AD] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0046] * | by applicant | JP2019188899 | JP2020172879 |