EP4060851 - CONTROLLER FOR ENERGY STORAGE AND METHODS OF USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.04.2023 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states China Energy Investment Corporation Limited No.22 Xibinhe Road, Anding Gate Dongcheng District Beijing 100011 / CN | For all designated states National Institute of Clean-and-Low-Carbon Energy Shenhua Low Carbon, 001 Post Box Future Science & Techonology Park Xiaotangshan Changping District Beijing 102209 / CN | [2022/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHARMA, Ratnesh Fremont, CA 94555 / US | 02 /
SINGH, Surinder Fremont, CA 94536 / US | 03 /
YU, Peng Fremont, CA 94539 / US | 04 /
ZHOU, You Beijing 102209 / CN | 05 /
ZHAO, Lulu Beijing 102209 / CN | 06 /
OHARA, Brandon Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2022/38] | Representative(s) | Ström & Gulliksson AB Box 5275 102 46 Stockholm / SE | [2022/38] | Application number, filing date | 22158913.8 | 25.02.2022 | [2022/38] | Priority number, date | US202117201529 | 15.03.2021 Original published format: US202117201529 | [2022/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4060851 | Date: | 21.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H02J3/38, H02J7/00 | [2022/38] | CPC: |
H02J7/0013 (EP);
H02J15/00 (CN);
H01M10/441 (US);
H02J3/38 (EP);
H02J7/0048 (EP,US);
H02J7/005 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/10] |
Former [2022/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERUNG FÜR EINEN ENERGIESPEICHER UND VERWENDUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2022/38] | English: | CONTROLLER FOR ENERGY STORAGE AND METHODS OF USING THE SAME | [2022/38] | French: | CONTRÔLEUR DE STOCKAGE D'ÉNERGIE ET SES PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION | [2022/38] | Examination procedure | 01.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/10] | 01.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2016226268 (OKUI YOSHIAKI [KR]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,8,10,12 * paragraphs [0037] - [0071]; figures 1-3 * [I] 3,6,9,11; | [XI]US2021050729 (ARVIND RAMYA V [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,8,10,12 * paragraphs [0040] - [0052]; figures 1, 1A; claims 1-13 *[I] 3,6,9,11 | by applicant | CN110518667 |