Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
12.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
13.04.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
19.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
12.02.2024 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
13.10.2023 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
13.10.2023 | First examination report | |
26.05.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
26.05.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 28.06.2023 [2023/26] |
26.05.2023 | Change - designated states | published on 28.06.2023 [2023/26] |
24.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant | |
10.02.2023 | Change - representative | |
21.10.2022 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 23.11.2022 [2022/47] |
04.03.2022 | Change - representative |