EP4053503 - ANGULAR RATE SENSOR BASED ON FREQUENCY MODULATION AND DRIVE STRATEGY FOR SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.12.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.03.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP USA, Inc. 6501 William Cannon Drive West Austin TX 78735 / US | [2022/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GEISBERGER, Aaron A 5656AG Eindhoven / NL | [2022/36] | Representative(s) | Hardingham, Christopher Mark NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Group Abbey House 25 Clarendon Road Redhill, Surrey RH1 1QZ / GB | [2022/36] | Application number, filing date | 22159181.1 | 28.02.2022 | [2022/36] | Priority number, date | US202117189776 | 02.03.2021 Original published format: US202117189776 | [2022/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4053503 | Date: | 07.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4053503 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01C19/5747, G01C19/56 | [2022/36] | CPC: |
G01C19/5747 (EP,US);
G01C19/5712 (CN,US);
G01C19/56 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/15] |
Former [2022/36] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | WINKELGESCHWINDIGKEITSSENSOR BASIEREND AUF FREQUENZMODULATION UND ANTRIEBSSTRATEGIE DAFÜR | [2022/36] | English: | ANGULAR RATE SENSOR BASED ON FREQUENCY MODULATION AND DRIVE STRATEGY FOR SAME | [2022/36] | French: | CAPTEUR DE VITESSE ANGULAIRE BASÉ SUR LA MODULATION DE FRÉQUENCE ET SA STRATÉGIE DE COMMANDE | [2022/36] | Examination procedure | 23.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/15] | 07.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2016003618 (BOSER BERNHARD E [US], et al) [A] 1-12* paragraphs [0038] , [0065] - [0082]; figures 1,6,8 *; | [A]EP3312559 (ST MICROELECTRONICS SRL [IT]) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0005] , [00 9] , [0 26] - [0059]; figures 1-4 *; | [A] - MITCHELL H KLINE ET AL, "Quadrature FM gyroscope", MICRO ELECTRO MECHANICAL SYSTEMS (MEMS), 2013 IEEE 26TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20130120), doi:10.1109/MEMSYS.2013.6474314, ISBN 978-1-4673-5654-1, pages 604 - 608, XP032339309 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MEMSYS.2013.6474314 |