|
17.03.2025 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.09.2024 |
Rectification of designation of inventor (Legal Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2024 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.05.2024 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2024 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2024 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.03.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2024 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2024 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.03.2024 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.03.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.03.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2024 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2023 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2023 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.12.2023 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.12.2023 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2023 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
54 |
|
04.12.2023 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
54 |
|
27.11.2023 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2023 |
Enquiry as to the processing of the file |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.05.2023 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
45 |
|
31.05.2023 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.05.2023 |
Description |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
31.05.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2023 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.04.2023 |
Change to the inventor details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2023 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.04.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.2023 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.03.2023 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.2023 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.03.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2023 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2023 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2023 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.12.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.12.2022 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.12.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2022 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.09.2022 |
Information about publication, reminder payment of designation fee, response to extended European search report, if applicable |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.08.2022 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.08.2022 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.08.2022 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.07.2022 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.07.2022 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2022 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.07.2022 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2022 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.2022 |
Payment submission rejected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.2022 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.05.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.2022 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.05.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.05.2022 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.2022 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
0 |
|
20.04.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.04.2022 |
Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.04.2022 |
Deficiencies in sequence listing |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.03.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2022 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2022 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.02.2022 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.02.2022 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
0 |
|
28.02.2022 |
Description |
Search / examination |
41 |
|
28.02.2022 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.02.2022 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
28.02.2022 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
28.02.2022 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.02.2022 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.02.2022 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.04.2018 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
67 |
|
09.04.2018 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
72 |