EP4030731 - SYMMETRIC PATH/LINK OVER LAG INTERFACE USING LLDP FOR TIME SYNCHRONIZATION BETWEEN TWO NODES USING PTP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.01.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Juniper Networks, Inc. 1133 Innovation Way Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | [2022/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
V.K, Prabhu Raj 560043 Bangalore / IN | 02 /
REDDY, M. Ramana 515641 Anantapur / IN | 03 /
GOPALAKRISHNAN, Kamatchi Soundaram Dublin, 94568 / US | [2022/29] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/29] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 22159590.3 | 25.03.2019 | [2022/29] | Priority number, date | US201815982901 | 17.05.2018 Original published format: US201815982901 | [2022/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4030731 | Date: | 20.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L45/24, H04J3/06 | [2022/29] | CPC: |
H04L45/245 (EP,US);
H04J3/0667 (EP,CN,US);
H04J3/0673 (US);
H04L41/12 (US);
H04L47/24 (US);
Y02D30/00 (EP);
Y02D30/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/08] |
Former [2022/29] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYMMETRISCHER PFAD/SYMMETRISCHER LINK ÜBER KANALBÜNDELUNGSSCHNITTSTELLE UNTER VERWENDUNG VON LLDP ZUR ZEITSYNCHRONISATION ZWISCHEN ZWEI KNOTEN MIT PTP | [2022/29] | English: | SYMMETRIC PATH/LINK OVER LAG INTERFACE USING LLDP FOR TIME SYNCHRONIZATION BETWEEN TWO NODES USING PTP | [2022/29] | French: | TRAJET/LIAISON SYMÉTRIQUE SUR UNE INTERFACE DE DÉCALAGE UTILISANT LE PROTOCOLE LLDP POUR LA SYNCHRONISATION TEMPORELLE ENTRE DEUX N UDS UTILISANT LE PROTOCOLE PTP | [2022/29] | Examination procedure | 17.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/08] | 17.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19164816.1 / EP3570505 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2013336117 (YAN DESMOND [CA], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0041] * * figure 4 *; | [A]EP2701342 (ZTE CORP [CN]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0081] * * paragraph [0100] - paragraph [0101] * * figures 6,7 *; | [A]US2015271088 (AO TING [CN]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0083] * * figures 2,6 *; | [A]US2016173216 (YANG QINGFENG [CN], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0097] - paragraph [0098] * * paragraph [0101] - paragraph [0104] ** figure 1 * |