EP4054023 - CHARGING GUN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nio Technology (Anhui) Co., Ltd Building F Hengchuang Intelligent Science and Technology Park No. 3963 Susong Road Economic and Technological Development Zone Hefei City, Anhui 230601 / CN | [2022/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XIA, Lijian AnTing Town, Jiading Shanghai / CN | 02 /
ZHAO, Haibin AnTing Town, Jiading Shanghai / CN | [2022/36] | Representative(s) | Patentwerk B.V. P.O. Box 1514 5200 BN 's-Hertogenbosch / NL | [2022/36] | Application number, filing date | 22159596.0 | 02.03.2022 | [2022/36] | Priority number, date | CN202110236084 | 03.03.2021 Original published format: CN202110236084 | [2022/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4054023 | Date: | 07.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/70, H01R13/627, B60L53/16 | [2022/36] | CPC: |
B60L53/16 (EP,CN,US);
H01R13/70 (CN);
H01R13/42 (CN);
H01R13/6272 (EP);
H01R13/639 (US);
H01R13/6616 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/14] |
Former [2022/36] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LADEPISTOLE | [2022/36] | English: | CHARGING GUN | [2022/36] | French: | PISTOLET DE CHARGE | [2022/36] | Examination procedure | 02.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/14] | 02.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CN108657005 (CHENGDU KENBAOJIE XUYANG NEW ENERGY ELECTRIC APPLIANCE CO LTD) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [YD]CN208706998U (YUEQING RONGSHENG INTRODUCED ELECTRIC APPLIANCES CO LTD) [YD] 1-10* the whole document * | by applicant | CN208706998U |