EP4057454 - CONNECTOR COMPRISING A CONTINUITY RECOVERY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.02.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SK | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Omelcom ZA en Beauvoir 360 rue de la Outarde 01500 Chateau-Gaillard / FR | [2022/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLERC, Patrice 01960 PERONNAS / FR | 02 /
PIN, Jean-Patrick 01330 VILLARS LES DOMBES / FR | 03 /
BABIARZ, Romuald 01120 MONTLUEL / FR | [2022/37] | Representative(s) | Germain Maureau 12, rue Boileau 69006 Lyon / FR | [2022/37] | Application number, filing date | 22159804.8 | 02.03.2022 | [2022/37] | Priority number, date | FR20210002331 | 10.03.2021 Original published format: FR 2102331 | [2022/37] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4057454 | Date: | 14.09.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4057454 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/6594, // H01R4/2433, H01R13/502, H01R24/64 | [2022/37] | CPC: |
H01R13/6594 (EP);
H01R13/502 (EP);
H01R24/64 (EP);
H01R4/2433 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/12] |
Former [2022/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | STECKER, DER EIN SYSTEM ZUR WIEDERHERSTELLUNG DER KONTINUITÄT UMFASST | [2022/37] | English: | CONNECTOR COMPRISING A CONTINUITY RECOVERY SYSTEM | [2022/37] | French: | CONNECTEUR COMPRENANT UN SYSTÈME DE REPRISE DE CONTINUITÉ | [2022/37] | Examination procedure | 16.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/12] | 16.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 03.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 08.11.2023 | ES | 08.11.2023 | HR | 08.11.2023 | PL | 08.11.2023 | RO | 08.11.2023 | RS | 08.11.2023 | SK | 08.11.2023 | SM | 08.11.2023 | NO | 08.02.2024 | GR | 09.02.2024 | IS | 08.03.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 08.11.2023 | |
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RO | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SM | 08.11.2023 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 08.11.2023 | |
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SM | 08.11.2023 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | ES | 08.11.2023 | |
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 09.02.2024 | |
IS | 08.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2899028 (SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC IND SAS [FR]) [A] 1-10 * figures 22-29 *; | [A]EP3363082 (LEVITON MANUFACTURING CO [US]) [A] 1-10 * figures 7-9 *; | [A]US10594088 (CUPPLES KENNETH ALAN [US], et al) [A] 1-10* figures 1,7 * |