Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP4026549 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP4026549



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 547
10.01.2025 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
10.01.2025 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 141
10.01.2025 Description Search / examination 91
10.01.2025 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
10.01.2025 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
07.11.2024 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
04.11.2024 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
04.11.2024 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
04.11.2024 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
15.07.2024 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
15.07.2024 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
09.07.2024 Examination started Search / examination 1
19.12.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
19.12.2022 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
19.12.2022 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
19.12.2022 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 7
19.12.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
18.07.2022 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
15.06.2022 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
07.06.2022 Refund of fees Search / examination 2
01.06.2022 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
01.06.2022 European search opinion Search / examination 3
01.06.2022 European search report Search / examination 3
01.06.2022 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
23.05.2022 Search started Search / examination 1
16.05.2022 Payment submission rejected Search / examination 1
02.03.2022 Abstract Search / examination 1
02.03.2022 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
02.03.2022 Claims Search / examination 4
02.03.2022 Description Search / examination 114
02.03.2022 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
02.03.2022 Drawings Search / examination 4
02.03.2022 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 4
02.03.2022 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
02.03.2022 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
19.12.2016 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 129