EP4063916 - UNMANNED AERIAL VEHICLE ASSISTED POSITIONING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states T-Mobile USA, Inc. 12920 SE 38th Street Bellevue, WA 98006-1350 / US | [2022/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lekutai, Gaviphat Washington / US | [2022/39] | Representative(s) | Suddaby, Mark Edward Novagraaf UK 1st Floor 77 Gracechurch Street London EC3V 0AS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/39] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 22159832.9 | 02.03.2022 | [2022/39] | Priority number, date | US202117191274 | 03.03.2021 Original published format: US202117191274 | [2022/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4063916 | Date: | 28.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01S19/09, G01S5/00, G05D1/00, H04W4/44, H04B7/185 | [2022/39] | CPC: |
G01S19/09 (EP);
G01S19/03 (US);
G01S5/0072 (EP);
G05D1/101 (EP);
G08G5/0013 (US);
G08G5/0069 (US);
H04B7/18504 (EP);
H04W4/021 (US);
H04W4/44 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/18] |
Former [2022/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | UNBEMANNTE LUFTFAHRZEUG-HILFS-POSITIONIERUNG | [2022/39] | English: | UNMANNED AERIAL VEHICLE ASSISTED POSITIONING | [2022/39] | French: | POSITIONNEMENT ASSISTÉ DE VÉHICULE AÉRIEN SANS PILOTE | [2022/39] | Examination procedure | 24.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/18] | 24.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2532966 (NOKIA TECHNOLOGIES OY [FI]); | [A]WO2018071453 (T MOBILE USA INC [US]); | [Y]US2018156616 (BENNETT ROBERT [US], et al); | [Y]EP3664479 (T MOBILE USA INC [US]); | [A]US10715951 (RATASUK RAPEEPAT [US], et al) |