EP4239191 - LOAD SCHEDULING OF WIND TURBINE AUXILIARY DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.08.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy A/S Borupvej 16 7330 Brande / DK | [2023/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Alsig, Jens 8653 Them / DK | 02 /
Andersen, Claus 7400 Herning / DK | 03 /
Kjeldsen, Jens Christian 7400 Herning / DK | 04 /
Krøier, Kristian 7400 Herning / DK | 05 /
List, Dennis 6715 Esbjerg N / DK | [2023/36] | Representative(s) | SGRE-Association Siemens Energy Global GmbH & Co. KG SE I IM P Intellectual Property Siemenspromenade 9 91058 Erlangen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/36] | SGRE-Association Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy GmbH & Co KG Schlierseestraße 28 81539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 22159894.9 | 03.03.2022 | [2023/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4239191 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F03D17/00, F03D80/00, F03D7/02 | [2023/36] | CPC: |
F03D7/0264 (EP);
F03D80/003 (EP);
F03D17/021 (EP);
F05B2220/50 (EP);
F05B2270/1071 (EP);
F05B2270/335 (EP);
Y02E10/72 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LASTPLANUNG VON WINDTURBINENHILFSVORRICHTUNGEN | [2023/36] | English: | LOAD SCHEDULING OF WIND TURBINE AUXILIARY DEVICES | [2023/36] | French: | PLANIFICATION DE CHARGE DE DISPOSITIFS AUXILIAIRES D'ÉOLIENNE | [2023/36] | Examination procedure | 07.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/34] | 12.04.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/34] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2024 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP2166225 (VESTAS WIND SYS AS [DK]) [X] 1,3,4,6-8,10,12,14,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0058]; figures 2,4,5 * [I] 5; | [X]WO2012089698 (REPOWER SYSTEMS SE [DE], et al) [X] 1,3-8,10,12-15 * abstract * * page 3, line 28 - page 6, line 9 * * page 7, line 9 - page 8, line 21 * * page 9, line 1 - page 10, line 33 * * page 13, line 16 - line 19 * * page 15, line 16 - page 16, line 24 * * page 17, line 17 - line 25 * * page 18, line 18 - page 20, line 5 * * page 23, line 11 - page 24, line 22; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2012306270 (OH JUNG HWAN [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0016]; figures 1-4 * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0051] ** paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0088] *; | [XI]WO2016112918 (VESTAS WIND SYS AS [DK]) [X] 1-4,7-10,12-15 * abstract * * page 2, line 1 - line 29 * * page 3, line 1 - line 16 * * page 3, line 34 - page 4, line 2 * * page 4, line 14 - line 39 * * page 5, line 23 - line 39 * * page 6, line 13 - page 7, line 8 * * page 7, line 18 - line 34; figures 1,3 * [I] 5,6,11 |