EP4030418 - KEYBOARD SENSOR SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sonuus Limited 89 St Neots Road Eaton Ford St Neots, Cambridgeshire PE19 7AL / GB | [2022/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLARK, James Hastings St Neots, PE19 7AL / GB | 02 /
MCAULIFFE, John Michael St Neots, PE19 7AL / GB | [2022/29] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/29] | Ford, Esther Mary Marks & Clerk LLP 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB | Application number, filing date | 22160076.0 | 19.12.2018 | [2022/29] | Priority number, date | GB20170021448 | 20.12.2017 Original published format: GB 201721448 | GB20180012826 | 07.08.2018 Original published format: GB 201812826 | [2022/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4030418 | Date: | 20.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G10H1/055, G06F3/02, G10H1/18, G10H1/34 | [2022/29] | CPC: |
G10H1/0555 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G10H1/055 (CN,GB);
G10H1/182 (EP,CN,GB,KR,US);
G01D5/2073 (CN,GB);
G10H1/344 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H03K17/967 (EP,CN,KR);
H03K17/972 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G10H2220/221 (CN,GB,US);
G10H2220/271 (EP,CN,GB,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/29] | Title | German: | TASTATURSENSORSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN | [2022/29] | English: | KEYBOARD SENSOR SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2022/29] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR CAPTEURS DE CLAVIER | [2022/29] | Examination procedure | 03.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/29] | 17.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18829443.3 / EP3729416 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4425511 (BROSH AMNON [US]); | [X]US4580478 (BROSH AMNON [US], et al); | [A]US2004056781 (RIX SCOTT M [US], et al); | [A]US2006114129 (HENTY DAVID L [US]); | [A]US2015170625 (CLARK JAMES HASTINGS [GB], et al) | by applicant | US4838139 | US2009282962 | GB2494230 |